+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (76)
On May 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- CHAPTER 14 SLA 97
- OVERRIDE VETO: EFD OF LAW 7/31/97
On May 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- 1:35 PM 5/2/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- GOVERNOR'S VETO OVERRIDDEN Y40 N19 E1
On May 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 4/30/97
On April 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- 4:40 PM 4/18/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y14 N5 E1
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y12 N7 E1
On April 17, 1997 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y27 N10 E2 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RESCIND ACTION IN PASSING Y28 N9 E2 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y28 N10 E2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN
On April 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO (H)
On April 11, 1997 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y28 N10 E2
- COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N9 E2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RYAN, OGAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 10, 1997 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP 1DNP 1AM
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, KOHRING, MULDER,
- KELLY, MARTIN; DNP: DAVIES
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 3/5/97
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 3/21/97
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COURT) 3/14/97
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 2/3/97
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 2/3/97
- AM: GRUSSENDORF
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/97
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 24(FIN)
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y27 N10 E3
- DAVIES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On March 27, 1997 in the House:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y15 N4 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1DNC 3/25
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 24(FIN)
- PASSED Y14 N4 E2
- COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y14 N4 E2
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- FN TO CS (ADM)
On March 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (ADM, DHSS-2)
- PREVIOUS FN APPLIES (ADM)
- FN TO CS (COURT)
- NR: PEARCE; DNP: ADAMS; AM: PARNELL
- DP: SHARP, PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1DNP 1AM SAME TITLE
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO CS (DHSS)
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS APPLY (ADM, DHSS)
- PREVIOUS FNS APPLY (COURT, ADM)
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER, PARNELL; DNP: ELLIS
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1DNP SAME TITLE
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM, DHSS)
- FISCAL NOTES (COURT, ADM)
- DP:WILKEN, WARD, LEMAN, GREEN; DNP:ELLIS
- HES RPT 4DP 1DNP
On January 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- HES, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97