+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/1/13
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 40 SLA 13
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65
- FN2: (DOT)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2:05 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 24(TRA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, TUCK, KERTTULA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 24(TRA)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- FN2: (DOT)
- NR: KAWASAKI
- AUSTERMAN
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA, COSTELLO, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT HCS(TRA) 10DP 1NR
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- TRA RPT HCS(TRA) 6DP
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: LYNN, FEIGE, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 24
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 24
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2013
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 2DP 3NR
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: MEYER, BISHOP
- NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DOT)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: EGAN, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH
- TRA RPT 4DP 1NR
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS