+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 11:12 AM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 35 SLA 04
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 239(HES) AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 239(HES) AM
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- WILSON
- DP: GATTO; NR: SEATON, CISSNA, WOLF,
- HES RPT 1DP 4NR
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 239(HES) AM
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y16 N3 E1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 239(HES) AM
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- WILKEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- AM: WILKEN
- DP: DYSON; NR: GUESS, GREEN;
- HES RPT CS 1DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/2/04
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor