+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/7/02
- 1:36 PM 5/23/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 36 SLA 02
On May 8, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 238(RLS)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/02
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 238(RLS)
On May 6, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- NR: BERKOWITZ
- DP: MEYER, COGHILL, ROKEBERG;
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
On May 1, 2002 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR W/CS 4/30 SAME TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 238(RLS)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 238(RLS)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- NR: COWDERY, WILKEN, WARD;
- TRA RPT CS(STA) 1DP 3NR
- DP: ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DAVIS; NR: HALFORD
- DP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS, STEVENS,
- STA RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- STA, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor