+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): EGAN
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN2: (ADM)
- FN1: (ADM)
- NR: KOOKESH
- DP: MENARD, PASKVAN, MEYER, FRENCH
- STA RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 1NR
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS
- L&C RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- FN1: (ADM)
- NR: BUNDE
- FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, THOMAS, DAVIS
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- L&C, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor