+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (125)
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 6:04 PM 7/27/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/31 CHAPTER 1 TSSLA 17
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) & (B) UC
On July 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL - SCR 301
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y2 N17 E1
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULES 42(A) AND (B) UC
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- MACKINNON (CHAIR), HOFFMAN, OLSON
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- MOTION TO CONVENE THIRD SPECIAL SESSION Y38 N2
- THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
- TAKE UP RECEDE MESSAGE UC
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM Y2 N38
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FCC REPORT READ
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40
- FOSTER (CHAIR), SEATON, PRUITT
- FCC REPORT TAKEN UP UC
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(C) Y33 N7
- FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 23 RECEIVED 7/27/17 1:55 P.M.
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y27 N13 FCCS SB 23
On July 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y15 N4 E1 FCCS SB 23
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(C) UC
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
- FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 23 RECEIVED 7/27/17 1:55 P.M.
On July 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- MOTION TO CONVENE THIRD SPECIAL SESSION Y17 N1 E1 A1
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- ENGROSSED & RETURNED TO SENATE 6/22
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RESCIND ACTION ON PASSAGE Y22 N18
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ACTION AM 17 Y22 N18
- LIMIT DEBATE ON AM TO 2 MIN EACH Y22 N18
- AM NO 17 ADOPTED Y22 N18
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- HCS CSSB 23(FIN) AM H (BRF SUP MAJ FLD H)(EFD FLD H)
- LIMIT DEBATE IN THIRD TO 2 MIN EACH Y22 N17 P1
- PASSED Y22 N18
- CBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y22 N18
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N18
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION:
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- AM NO 5 RULED OUT OF ORDER
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y9 N31
- AM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y22 N18
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y13 N27
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N21 A1
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y23 N17
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y26 N14
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 23(FIN)
- RESCIND ACTION (ADP)AM 1 Y10 N30
- AM NO 9 ADOPTED Y24 N16
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y12 N28
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y15 N25
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y11 N28 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N18
- PASSED Y23 N17
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y19 N21
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y18 N22
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y15 N24 A1
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y8 N32
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y18 N22
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y12 N28
- RESCIND ACTION (FLD)AM 10 UC
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- AM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, PRUITT, GRENN, TILTON
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 5DP 1DNP 5AM
- DNP: NEUMAN
- DP: GARA, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
- RULES TO CALENDAR 6/12/2017
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y13 N6 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 23(FIN) AM
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y6 N14
- MOVED TO TOP OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 23(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N11
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y6 N14
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y5 N15
- GARDNER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y7 N13
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y4 N14 E2
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y13 N5 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N- E2
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y7 N13
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- AM: OLSON
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (17)
AM 17
AM NO 17 OFFERED
AM 16
AM NO 16 OFFERED
AM 15
AM NO 15 OFFERED
AM 12
AM NO 12 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
AM 13
AM NO 13 FAILED Y4 N14 E2
AM 14
AM NO 14 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
AM 9
AM NO 9 FAILED Y7 N13
AM 10
AM NO 10 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
AM 11
AM NO 11 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
AM 7
AM NO 7 FAILED Y6 N14
AM 8
AM NO 8 FAILED Y7 N13
AM 3
AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
AM 4
AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
AM 5
AM NO 5 FAILED Y6 N14
AM 6
AM NO 6 FAILED Y5 N15
AM 2
AM NO 2 OFFERED
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor