+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (73)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 128 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- 3:09 PM 6/9/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 224(STA)
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 224(STA)
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 1DNP 6NR
- DP: MEYER, JOULE, CROFT, WILLIAMS;
- DNP: FATE; NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, MOSES,
- CHENAULT, FOSTER, HARRIS
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
- FN7: ZERO(HSS)
- FN8: ZERO(ADM)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN11: ZERO(H.FIN/ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: SAMUELS, MCGUIRE; NR: GARA,
- GRUENBERG, OGG
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
- FN7: ZERO(HSS)
- FN8: ZERO(ADM)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN10: (ADM)
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 224(STA)
- COSPONSOR(S): ELTON, DAVIS, SEEKINS,
- STEVENS G, ELLIS, WAGONER, STEVENS B,
- OGAN, GUESS, FRENCH, DYSON
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 224(STA)
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 5DP 2NR
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN, BUNDE,
- STEVENS B; NR: GREEN, OLSON
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
- FN7: ZERO(HSS)
- FN8: ZERO(ADM)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN10: (ADM)
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN8: ZERO(ADM)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN10: (ADM)
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY;
- NR: STEDMAN, GUESS
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
- FN7: ZERO(HSS)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: COWDERY, WAGONER; NR: THERRIAULT,
- LINCOLN
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor