+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 224(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 224(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2012
On April 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On March 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: EGAN, DAVIS, MENARD, PASKVAN
- L&C RPT 4DP
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor