+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/12/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/14 CHAPTER 78 SLA 05
On July 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- 2:13 PM 6/30/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 22(FIN)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y34 N1 A5
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 9, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2005
- DP: FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT;
- NR: HAWKER, HOLM, STOLTZE, JOULE, MOSES, KELLY
- FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- PASSED Y33 N1 E4 A2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 22(FIN)
- RAMRAS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, LYNN, GARA
- FIN RPT 3DP 6NR
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2005
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 22(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, ELLIS, ELTON, KOOKESH, OLSON, GUESS
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 22(FIN)
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- NR: OLSON, STEDMAN
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, HOFFMAN, DYSON
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- DP: DYSON, ELTON, WILKEN
- HES RPT 3DP
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/04
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor