+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/23/21
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/25 CHAPTER 26 SLA 21
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 4:45 P.M. 8/20/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 22
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y38 N2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 22
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- FN2: (DFG)
- AM: WOOL
- NR: EDGMON
- DNP: JOSEPHSON
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, CARPENTER, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 8DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- DP: MCKAY, CRONK, RAUSCHER, HANNAN, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK
- RES RPT 7DP 1NR
- NR: HOPKINS
- FN2: (DFG)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2021
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 22
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 22
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN2: (DFG)
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF
- FIN RPT 5DP
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DFG)
- NR: KIEHL, KAWASAKI
- DP: REVAK, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor