+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 10, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- SENATE ZERO FN (DPS) 1/30/98
- INDETERMINATE SENATE FN (LAW) 1/30/98
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 4/23/98
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COR) 4/30/98
- NR: GREEN, PORTER, JAMES, ROKEBERG
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4NR
- SENATE ZERO FN (REV) 4/24/98
On May 2, 1998 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FN TO CS (COR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/98
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, PARNELL, MILLER
- PASSED Y19 N1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 219(FIN) AM
On April 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO CS (REV)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- DONLEY; NR: ADAMS, TORGERSON
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- FN TO CS (LAA)
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN APPLIES (LAW)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN APPLIES (DPS)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- FN TO CS (LAA)
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SB (DPS)
- INDETERMINATE FN TO SB (LAW)
- FISCAL NOTE TO SB (LAA)
- DP: MILLER, TAYLOR; NR PEARCE
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On January 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/98