+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/24/04
- 10:33AM 7/19/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 176 SLA 04
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, GARA, ANDERSON
- VERSION: CSSB 217(JUD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- ADOPTED SENATE LETTER OF INTENT UC
- PASSED Y34 E1 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 217(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- OGG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT 7DP
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA, GRUENBERG,
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- SENATE LETTER OF INTENT WITH JUD RPT
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELLIS, OGAN, GUESS, COWDERY, STEDMAN,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 217(JUD)
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, FRENCH, ELTON,
- SEEKINS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- LINCOLN, WAGONER
- PASSED Y20 N-
- ADOPTED JUD LETTER OF INTENT UC
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 217(JUD)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH JUD REPORT
- NR: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, OGAN;
- DP: FRENCH
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- AM: GREEN, WILKEN
- DP: DYSON; NR: GUESS;
- HES RPT CS 1DP 1NR 2AM NEW TITLE
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor