+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
- RULES TO 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL CAL 5/11/98
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF THE CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RYAN, CROFT, DYSON
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- 4 S FNS (ADM, COR, DHSS, COURTS) 4/22/98
- DP: GREEN; NR: ROKEBERG, BUNDE, JAMES
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 1DP 3NR
- 2 SENATE FNS (ADM, LAW) 4/23/98
On April 30, 1998 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, LINCOLN, WARD,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 216(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- MACKIE
On April 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- DP: PARNELL, PHILLIPS; NR: PEARCE,
- FIN RPT 2DP 3NR (JUD)CS
- SHARP, TORGERSON
- PREVIOUS FNS (ADM-2, COR, LAW,
- DHSS, COURT)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- CORRECTED FNS (NO. 2/ADM, NO. 4/LAW)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- DHSS, COURT)
- FNS TO SB & CS (ADM-2, COR, LAW,
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER; NR: ELLIS, PEARCE
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On January 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED - 1/9/98
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor