+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 51 SLA 08
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/09
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- 3:40 PM 5/12/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 5, 2008 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 6DP 2NR
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 27
- DP: HAWKER, NELSON, CRAWFORD, FOSTER, THOMAS, CHENAULT
- NR: JOULE, KELLY
- FN2: (DFG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 214(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, LYNN, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, KERTTULA, CHENAULT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 214(FIN)
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- MLV RPT HCS(MLV) 3DP 2NR
- DP: BUCH, DAHLSTROM, ROSES
- NR: KAWASAKI, LEDOUX
- FN1: (DFG)
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, FIN
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 214(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 214(FIN)
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, DYSON, HUGGINS
- FN1: (DFG)
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, STEDMAN
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: HUGGINS, STEVENS, MCGUIRE, GREEN
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: (DFG)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/08
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor