+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/17/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 44 SLA 14
- 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 213
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 213
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DP: HERRON, KITO III, NAGEAK, LEDOUX
- CRA RPT 4DP
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 213
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 213
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2014
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL
- CRA RPT 4DP
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor