+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/3/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/2 CHAPTER 133 SLA 03
- 4:13 PM 6/25/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 210
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y29 N8 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 210
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- L&C RPT 7DP
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 210
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 210
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2003
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, SEEKINS, STEVENS G;
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor