+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN, WTR
On May 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 210(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1 NR 5/5/96
- PLACE AT BOTTOM OF CALENAR UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N11
- COSPONSOR: RIEGER, SHARP
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FN (REV)
- FIN RPT 3DP 4NR (STA)CS
On April 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (REV)
On April 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO SB (REV)
- STA RPT CS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)