+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/25 CHAPTER 29 SLA 21
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:45 P.M. 8/20/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- FN2: (CC:HB69/CED)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 6
- MOTION TO DIVIDE AM NO 2 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 21(L&C) AM H
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SHAW, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, TARR, VANCE, RAUSCHER, KAUFMAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 21(L&C) AM H
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NEW TITLE 7DP
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 6
- DP: SNYDER, SCHRAGE, NELSON, KAUFMAN, MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRONK
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- NR: KURKA, ZULKOSKY
- DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, PRAX, SNYDER
- HSS RPT 5DP 2NR
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 21
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, GRAY-JACKSON, OLSON, KAWASAKI, STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 21
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- DP: HOLLAND, STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK
- L&C RPT 4DP
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- NR: BEGICH
- DP: WILSON, COSTELLO, HUGHES
- HSS RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, MICCICHE
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor