+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL CAL 5/11/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N32 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 1DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: PORTER; DNP: ELTON; NR: PHILLIPS,
- WILLIAMS, KOTT
- SENATE IND FN (GOV/ALL DEPTS) 1/21/98
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 1/21/98
- REFERRED TO RLS
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- FIN RPT 6DP
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, MULDER, MARTIN,
- KOHRING, DAVIS
- SENATE IND FN (GOV/ALL DEPTS) 1/21/98
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 1/21/98
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/29/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 209
- PASSED Y14 N5 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: PEARCE, SHARP, PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- NR: ADAMS
- PREVIOUS FN (LAA)
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN (GOV)
On January 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: MILLER, WARD, GREEN; NR: DUNCAN
- FISCAL NOTE (LAA)
- INDETERMINATE FN (GOV)
On January 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/2/98
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor