+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 69 SLA 06
On June 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- 3:17 PM 6/6/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, GARDNER, THOMAS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELKINS - FIRST CROSS SPONSOR
- VERSION: CSSB 209(JUD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y34 N1 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 209(JUD)
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2006
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, HAWKER, KERTTULA
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELKINS
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(H.FIN/DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- DP: HAWKER, WEYHRAUCH, MOSES, HOLM, KELLY, FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT 8DP
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 209(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2006
- VERSION: CSSB 209(JUD)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, DYSON, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, DYSON, SEEKINS, STEVENS G, STEDMAN, GREEN, THERRIAULT,
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- ELLIS, STEVENS B, COWDERY, ELTON
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, GUESS, HUGGINS
- JUD RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/05
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor