+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 45 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/14
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 206(STA)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, LEDOUX, LYNN, JOSEPHSON, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSSB 206(STA) AM H
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MILLETT, OLSON, FEIGE, COSTELLO, ISAACSON, HOLMES,
- HAWKER, MUNOZ
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: ISAACSON, LYNN, GATTIS, HUGHES, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/09/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 206(STA)
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, EGAN
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 206(STA)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor