+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- 9:35 AM 7/20/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 70 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, STEVENS, COSTELLO, BISHOP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 204(STA) AM H
- PASSED Y37 N1 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E1 A1
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 32
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 204(STA) AM H
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 A1
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y40
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, LEDOUX, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/8 - ON 5/9 CALENDAR
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- STA RPT HCS(STA) NT 7DP
- PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
- DP: TUCK, BIRCH, KNOPP, WOOL, LEDOUX, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 204
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 204
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
- NR: WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor