+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 201
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 201
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 3DP 4NR
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
- NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, HOFFMAN
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: STEVENS, ELLIS
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor