+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/24/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/23 CHAPTER 23 SLA 04
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:36 AM 4/6/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 201(HES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2004
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y39 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 201(HES)
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- KAPSNER, WILSON; NR: GATTO
- DP: WOLF, COGHILL, SEATON, CISSNA,
- HES RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- NR: COGHILL, BERKOWITZ
- DP: SEATON, HOLM, LYNN, WEYHRAUCH;
- STA RPT 4DP 2NR
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- STA, HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 201(HES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/01/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 201(HES)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, WILKEN; NR: GUESS
- HES RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON
- STA RPT 3DP
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor