+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 4 SSSLA 02
- 3:28 PM 6/27/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 20, 2002 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT,
- LANCASTER, HUDSON, FOSTER, MULDER,
- WILLIAMS
- FN2: ZERO(H.FIN/ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED Y26 N11 E3
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N24 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 2001(FIN)
On May 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
On May 20, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- JAMES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 2001(FIN)
On May 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y13 N6 E1
On May 20, 2002 in the House:
- PASSED Y37 E3
On May 19, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/02
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED REFERRED TO FIN
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- IN STATE AFFAIRS
On May 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: DONLEY, KELLY, GREEN, AUSTERMAN,
- HOFFMAN, OLSON, WILKEN, LEMAN, WARD
- FN1: (ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 2001
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- LEMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 2001
On May 18, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor