+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (101)
On July 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 73 SLA 06
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/06
On June 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- 3:17 PM 6/6/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N6
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 20(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N25
- AM NOS 2 - 3 NOT OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y14 N26
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y14 N26
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- NEW AM NO 6 FAILED Y14 N25 E1
- PASSED Y30 N9 E1
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/3 - ON 5/4 CALENDAR
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- HELD TO 5/3 CALENDAR
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 20(FIN)
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2006
On April 26, 2006 in the House:
- DNP: KERTTULA;
- DP: STOLTZE, KELLY, FOSTER, MEYER;
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 1DNP 4NR 2AM
- AM: HAWKER, JOULE
- NR: HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, MOSES, CHENAULT;
- FN9: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(COR)
- FN5: ZERO(CRT)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- DP: COGHILL, WILSON, ANDERSON, KOTT, MCGUIRE;
- FN4: ZERO(COR)
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 2AM
- AM: GARA, GRUENBERG
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN5: ZERO(CRT)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTO
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 20(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 20(JUD)
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y11 N8 E1
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
- JUD CS ADOPTED Y11 N5 E3 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2005
On April 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: WILKEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: GREEN, DYSON
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 2DP 3NR
On April 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- JUD RPT CS(2D JUD) 3DP 2AM SAME TITLE
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- AM: FRENCH, GUESS
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- JUD CS RECEIVED SAME TITLE
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO JUD COMMITTEE
On April 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- NR: GUESS
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- JUD RPT CS FORTHCOMING 3DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: DAVIS
- AM: THERRIAULT, ELTON, WAGONER, HUGGINS
- STA RPT CS 4AM 1NR SAME TITLE
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/04