+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- FN3: (H.FIN/DNR)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/16/13
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/15 CHAPTER 7 SLA 13
On April 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3:53 PM 4/14/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 2
- PASSED Y35 E2 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, REINBOLD, FEIGE, SADDLER, TUCK, JOHNSON, PRUITT,
- JOSEPHSON, LEDOUX
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HOLMES, T.WILSON
- FN3: (H.FIN/DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: KAWASAKI
- AUSTERMAN
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA, COSTELLO, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT 10DP 1NR
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP
- FN1: (DNR)
- DP: JOHNSON, TUCK, HAWKER, P.WILSON, TARR, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, P.WILSON
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 2
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2013
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: DNR
- NR: OLSON
- DP: MEYER, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- DUNLEAVY, KELLY
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, STEDMAN, EGAN, BISHOP,
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: DNR
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- STA RPT 4DP
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor