+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/4/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 84 SLA 01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 198(HES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 7, 2001 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 198(HES)
- PASSED Y37 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT, KAPSNER,
- MURKOWSKI, MCGUIRE, CRAWFORD
On May 6, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: (HSS)
- HUDSON, WILLIAMS; NR: BUNDE
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
On May 4, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PORTER, STEVENS
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 198(HES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 4/30/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FN2: (HSS)
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIS, TAYLOR, KELLY,
- ELTON, AUSTERMAN, THERRIAULT, COWDERY
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 198(HES)
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: (HSS)
- HOFFMAN, OLSON, WILKEN, LEMAN, WARD
- DP: DONLEY, KELLY, GREEN, AUSTERMAN,
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 9DP
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: (HSS)
- NR: WILKEN
- DP: GREEN, LEMAN, DAVIS, WARD;
- HES RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor