+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- 4:55 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 141 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCURRENCE READ AND HELD
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 190(RLS)
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 190(RLS)
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 2DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL; DNP: ROKEBERG;
- NR: BERKOWITZ, MORGAN, KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT HCS(CRA) 2DP 4NR
- DP: HEINZE, LYNN; NR: GATTO, WOLF,
- MASEK, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- CRA RPT HCS(CRA) 4DP 2NR
- DP: ANDERSON, WOLF, KOOKESH, MORGAN;
- NR: SAMUELS, CISSNA
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, RES
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 190(STA)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 190(STA)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/4 CALENDAR
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS(STA) 3DP 1NR
- DP: OGAN, STEVENS B, SEEKINS; NR: ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- NR: GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, RES
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor