+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 25 SLA 22
- 2:45 P.M. 6/23/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NEW TITLE 6DP 1NR
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, JOHNSON, FOSTER
- NR: MERRICK
- FN3: (CED)
- LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 190(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 190(FIN)
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 4NR
- NR: MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, NELSON
- DP: SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN3: (CED)
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 190(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 190(FIN)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/8 CAL
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, OLSON
- DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
- FIN RPT CS 3NR 3DP NEW TITLE
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, MICCICHE, REVAK
- L&C RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor