+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 14, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN4: (H.FIN/REV)
- FN3: (ADM)
- EDGMON, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, DOOGAN, COSTELLO,
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 31
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 11DP
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 19(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 19(FIN)
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN2: (REV)
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: STEDMAN, THOMAS, OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, EGAN, ELLIS
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 3NR NEW TITLE
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: (REV)
- DP: KOOKESH, EGAN, THOMAS, MENARD
- TRA RPT 4DP
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor