+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 12 SLA 21
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- 9:08 A.M. 6/28/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- FN2: (EED)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 19(FIN)
- PASSED Y35 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 19(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, STORY, TARR, JOSEPHSON
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- FN2: (EED)
- NR: CARPENTER, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, THOMPSON
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 6DP 4NR
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y15 N- E5
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLLAND, REVAK
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 19(FIN)
- VERSION: CSSB 19(FIN)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/29 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- FN2: (EED)
- NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, OLSON
- DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: (EED)
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH
- EDC RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON, KAWASAKI, MICCICHE
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor