+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (84)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- DEPT. COR, STATISTICAL REVIEW REPORT RECEIVED
- DEPT. COR, 2018 AND 2019 OFFENDER PROFILE REPORT RECEIVED
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- DEPT. EED, STATEWIDE SUICIDE PREVENTION COUNCIL REPORT RECEIVED
- DEPT. COR, STATISTICAL REVIEW RECEIVED
- DEPT. COR, DIV. ADMIN., OFFENDER PROFILE REPORTS RECEIVED
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO GOVERNOR
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- MOTION TO OVERRIDE LINE ITEM VETOES WITHDRAWN UC
- MOTION TO OVERRIDE LINE ITEM VETOES
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- OMB SPREADSHEET ATTACHED
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 3 FSSLA 19
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 11:45 A.M. 6/17/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- ENGROSSED & RETURNED TO SENATE 6/14
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y15 N2 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y13 N23 E4
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
- SESSION CANCELED 6/10 - ON 6/11 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
- SESSION CANCELED 6/11 - ON 6/12 CALENDAR
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 6DP 1NR 4AM
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER
- AM: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- RULES TO CALENDAR 6/12/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N21 E4
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- NR: KNOPP
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N23 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSSSB 19(FIN) AM H
- VERSION: HCS CSSSSB 19(FIN) AM H(BRF SUP MAJ FLD H)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- CBRF SECTION(S) FAILED Y23 N13 E4
- PASSED Y31 N5 E4
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- AM NO 10 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 9 ADOPTED Y22 N14 E4
- AM NO 8 ADOPTED Y29 N6 E4 A1
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED Y32 N4 E4
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED Y34 N1 E4 A1
- AM NO 5 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
On June 9, 2019 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/28 - ON NEXT CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 6DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, SHOWER, BISHOP
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON
- AM: OLSON
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 19(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSSSB 19(FIN)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor