+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 94 SLA 14
- 11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 183
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 183
- PASSED Y40
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, GARA, DRUMMOND, ISAACSON
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: CHENAULT, HERRON, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT 5DP
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, TUCK
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: DUNLEAVY, ELLIS
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2014
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: SB 183
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 183
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, STEVENS, ELLIS, MICCICHE, KELLY, GARDNER, BISHOP, GIESSEL,
- COGHILL
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor