+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 183(STA)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 183(STA)
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: COGHILL
- NR: REVAK, WILSON
- STA RPT CS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor