+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/17/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 77 SLA 06
On June 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- 3:17 PM 6/6/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 177(HES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- ROKEBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
On April 29, 2006 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 177(HES)
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/1 CALENDAR
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/29 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2006
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: CRAWFORD, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG, LYNN
- DP: KOTT;
- L&C RPT 1DP 4NR
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: ANDERSON, WILSON;
- NR: CISSNA, GARDNER
- FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- HES, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 177(HES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 177(HES)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/2006
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/22 CALENDAR
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: DAVIS, ELLIS
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- L&C RPT CS(HES) 3DP 2NR
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: GREEN
- DP: DYSON, ELTON
- HES RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- HES, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor