+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 39 SLA 93
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- 12:00 PM 5/7/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 27, 1993 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, PARNELL,HANLEY
- EFFECTIVE DATES VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 N2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 173(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 26, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/93
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- DP: GREEN, KOTT, JAMES, PORTER, NORDLUND
- JUD RPT 6DP 1NR
- -SENATE ZERO FN (DCED) 3/31/93
- DP: PHILLIPS
- NR: DAVIDSON
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 22, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On April 19, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE
On April 16, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NORDLUND, ULMER
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 14, 1993 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 13, 1993 in the Senate:
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- RET TO SECOND FOR AM 6 FAILED Y10 N10
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 173(FIN)
On April 12, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N11 E3 A1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N11 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N11 E3 A1
- AM NO 4 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N11 E3 A1
- FAILED TO ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG Y11 N6 E3
- THIRD READING 4/13 CALENDAR
On April 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN APPLIES TO CS
- FIN RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On March 31, 1993 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- L&C RPT 4DP 1AM
On March 25, 1993 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor