+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (94)
On June 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/19/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/18 CHAPTER 38 SLA 06
On May 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- 2:13 PM 5/15/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN4: (H.FIN/GOV)
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT: CCS SB 172
- FN3: (GOV)
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- FN5: (LAW)
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y34 E1 A5 CCS SB 172
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS SB 172
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- SEATON (CHAIR), MEYER, GARA
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM N34 E4 A2
- RECEDE MESSAGE
On April 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- THERRIAULT (CHAIR), BUNDE, ELTON
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y- N20
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- AM NO 13 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 13 UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: HCS SB 172(FIN) AM H
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N3 A2
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 4/19 CALENDAR
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 3 AS AM FAILED Y16 N20 E2 A2
- AM TO AM 3 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 AND ALL AMS UC
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y23 N14 E2 A1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED Y19 N18 E2 A1
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 172(FIN)
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED Y28 N8 E2 A2
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y13 N23 E2 A2
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y17 N20 E2 A1
- AM NO 7 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 11 WITHDRAWN
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y24 N10 E6
- PASSED Y29 N5 E6
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 12 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM TO AM 11 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 11 OFFERED
- AM NO 10 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y13 N20 E5 A2
- AM NO 8 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- NEW AM NO 7 ADOPTED Y22 N9 E5 A4
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2006
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- DP: HAWKER, FOSTER, WEYHRAUCH, MEYER;
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 4DP 3NR 1AM
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 37
- NR: KELLY, STOLTZE, MOSES;
- AM: KERTTULA
- FN3: (GOV)
- FN4: (H.FIN/GOV)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)
- AM: GARA
- DP: COGHILL, WILSON, ANDERSON, KOTT, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE;
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT (TECHNICAL) 6DP 1AM
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: GARDNER, GRUENBERG
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, ELKINS, SEATON;
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 4DP 2NR
On April 26, 2005 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 172
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 172
On April 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2005
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DP: THERRIAULT, WAGONER, HUGGINS, DAVIS
- STA RPT 4DP
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (21)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor