+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRONK
On April 26, 2024 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FSH
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On April 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 171
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N16 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y15 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 171
On April 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/22 CAL
On April 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: GIESSEL, KAUFMAN
- NR: CLAMAN, DUNBAR
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On April 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N16 A1
+ − Sponsors (3)
BJORKMAN
Type:
Primary Sponsor