+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/27/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/26 CHAPTER 27 SLA 93
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- 12:00 PM 5/7/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 27, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN, TOOHEY
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N8
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- CARNEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y33 N7
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 171(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 26, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/93
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LARSON
On April 22, 1993 in the House:
- NR: HANLEY, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- FIN RPT 3DP 5NR 1AM
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, MARTIN
- NR: NAVARRE, THERRIAULT
- -SENATE ZERO FN (DCED) 3/24/93
- AM: BROWN
On April 16, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 171(FIN)
On April 14, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/93
- THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FAILED TO ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG Y11 N9
On April 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCED)
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On March 24, 1993 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
On March 18, 1993 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)