+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/2/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 57 SLA 08
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- 3:40 PM 5/12/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- PASSED Y39 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, BUCH, JOHNSON
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 170(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2008
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 A4
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 170(FIN)
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES
- HES RPT HCS(HES) 6DP 1NR
- DP: CISSNA, FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, SEATON, ROSES, WILSON
- NR: KELLER
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(HSS)
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 170(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- MCGUIRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y16 N4
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 170(FIN)
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2008
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, OLSON
- FIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- HES LETTER OF INTENT RECEIVED
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- DP: DAVIS, ELTON
- HES RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 2AM
- HES LETTER OF INTENT FORTHCOMING
- AM: THOMAS, DYSON
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On May 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIS
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- AM: BUNDE, STEVENS
- DP: ELLIS, DAVIS
- L&C RPT CS 2DP 2AM SAME TITLE
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- L&C, HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS