+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/22 CHAPTER 27 SLA 16
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3:53 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 170(RES)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 170(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, TUCK, TILTON, SADDLER, PRUITT
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
- DP: SADDLER, PRUITT, WILSON, GUTTENBERG, GATTIS, NEUMAN, THOMPSON
- NR: KAWASAKI
- FN2: (DNR)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, GATTIS, GUTTENBERG
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- RES RPT 9DP
- DP: JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, HERRON, CHENAULT, OLSON, TARR, SEATON, TALERICO,
- NAGEAK
- FN2: (DNR)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 170(RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BISHOP, STEVENS, COGHILL, MACKINNON, GARDNER, COSTELLO
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 170(RES)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 5DP 1NR
- DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
- NR: OLSON
- FN2: (DNR)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 6DP SAME TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, MICCICHE, STOLTZE
- FN1: (DNR)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor