+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- JUD RPT 5DP
- DP: LEDOUX, FOSTER, GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(COR)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, DRUMMOND, TUCK
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 170
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, DYSON, DUNLEAVY
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 170
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP
- DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(COR)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COGHILL, BISHOP, ELLIS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor