+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (72)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 12:00 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- FN10: (DHS)
- FN11: (DHS)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 30 SLA 14
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 169(HSS)
- PASSED Y39 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI, LEDOUX, OLSON, SEATON,
- HOLMES, SADDLER, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 169(HSS)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(HSS) 8DP 1NR
- DP: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, THOMPSON, HOLMES, STOLTZE
- NR: GARA
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN10: (DHS)
- FN11: (DHS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- HSS RPT HCS(HSS) 2DP 3NR
- DP: SEATON, HIGGINS
- NR: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN6: (DHS)
- FN7: (DHS)
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, FIN
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 169(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 169(FIN)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2014
- HELD TO 3/21 CALENDAR
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: MEYER, KELLY, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN6: (DHS)
- FN7: (DHS)
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, MEYER, ELLIS
- FN1: (DHS)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN3: (DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor