+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 2/8 CHAPTER 1 SLA 96
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 2/9/96
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- 11:40 AM 1/22/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/19/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 166 AM
- PASSED Y36 N- E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 6, 1995 in the House:
- CRA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: KOTT, IVAN
- NR: AUSTERMAN, VEZEY
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (DOE, DCRA) 4/29/95
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA
On May 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 166 AM
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT 4CAL 1OTHER REC 5/1/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 3DP 1NR
- ZERO FNS (DCRA, DOE)
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor