+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On July 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2:13 PM 6/20/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 32 SLA 16
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/4/16
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- RESCIND ACTION IN FAILING TO CONCUR Y14 N2 E2 A2
- RESCIND ACTION IN FAILING TO CONCUR Y14 N2 E2 A2
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N2 E2 A2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 165(L&C)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y35 N4 E1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 165(L&C) AM H
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- MOTION TO TAKE UP WITHDRAWN UC
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y- N18 A2
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/16/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(L&C) 5DP
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, CLAMAN, FOSTER, LEDOUX
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(AJS)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 3NR
- DP: HUGHES, OLSON
- NR: TILTON, KITO, JOSEPHSON
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(AJS)
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 165(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 165(JUD) AM
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- DP: MCGUIRE, MICCICHE
- NR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(AJS)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEVENS, ELLIS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor