+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 35 SLA 14
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 162
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 162
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER
- DP: SEATON, HIGGINS
- HSS RPT 2DP 3NR
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 162
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 162
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2014
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, ELLIS
- DP: MEYER
- HSS RPT 1DP 3NR
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor