+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/5/96
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/7 CHAPTER 4 SLA 96
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- 2:40 PM 2/22/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- ROBINSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y25 N9 E4 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 160 AM
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/15 CALENDAR
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING FLD Y25 N14 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/96
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LABOR)
- NR: SANDERS, ROKEBERG
- DP: PORTER, KOTT
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y14 N5 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 160 AM
On May 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES RPT 3CAL 2DNC 5/5/95
On May 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LABOR)
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor