+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (62)
On January 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR VETO SUSTAINED Y34 N26
On June 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- 3:20 PM 6/15/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/16/95
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N4
On May 16, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 12, 1995 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N9 A4
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/12 CALENDAR
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 16(FIN)
- PASSED Y26 N14
- NAVARRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 3DP 3DNP 4NR
- DP: MULDER, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- DNP: GRUSSENDORF, NAVARRE, BROWN
- NR: FOSTER, HANLEY, PARNELL, KOHRING
- 2 SENATE FISCAL NOTES (F&G, DNR) 3/27/95
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/20/95
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (UA) 2/22/95
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/27/95
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/09/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES
On May 4, 1995 in the House:
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 3DP 3NR
- DP: DAVIES, WILLIAMS, GREEN
- NR: OGAN, AUSTERMAN, KOTT
- 2 SENATE FISCAL NOTES (F&G, DNR) 3/27/95
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/20/95
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/27/95
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On April 26, 1995 in the House:
- CRA REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 12, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA, RESOURCES, FINANCE
On April 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 16(FIN) AM
- COSPONSOR: MILLER
- (S) ADOPTED ZHAROFF LETTER OF INTENT
- PASSED Y11 N9
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 2NR SAME TITLE
- FNS TO CS (DNR, F&G)
- ZERO FN (REV)
- PREVIOUS FNS (UA, DNR)
On March 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 3DP 1DNP 1NR (CRA)CS
- FN (DNR)
- PREVIOUS FNS (F&G, DNR, UA)
- ZERO FNS (REV-2)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- FISCAL NOTES (F&G, DNR, UA)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTES (REV-2)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): RIEGER
On January 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA, RES, FIN
On January 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED - 1/6/95