+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (60)
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/5 CHAPTER 10 SLA 19
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:53 A.M. 7/01/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
- DP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, KNOPP, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD,
- ORTIZ, WILSON
- NR: LEBON
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN3: (CED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y22 N15 E1 A2
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y27 N10 E1 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 16(FIN) AM H
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, DRUMMOND, TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 16(FIN) AM H
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 5DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: HANNAN, REVAK, STORY, STUTES, WOOL
- AM: TALERICO
- NR: FIELDS
- FN3: (CED)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 16(FIN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEDMAN
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 16(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN3: (CED)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- DP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, WILSON
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE
- NR: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, SHOWER, OLSON
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, KIEHL, BIRCH, BISHOP, REINBOLD, STEVENS
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, BISHOP, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON
- L&C RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, WILSON
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor